WebMaharashtra Government has removed Shravan Hardikar, an IAS from the post of Inspector General of Registration & Stamps. He has been replaced by HS Sonawane, an IAS 10 Apr 2024 14:18:51 WebContact Us; Disclaimer; Shravan Hardikar IAS Top Stories Transfer . Maharashtra : Six IAS officers transferred. February 13, 2024 February 13, 2024 LO Bureau IAS TRANSFER, …
Civil List of IAS Officers - EASY
WebJan 1, 2024 · Shri Shravan P Hardikar Id No. 047800 22/08/2005;RR hs.pramod: 12/08/1978 2005;MH Maharashtra 43 Years: 13: Dr. Vipin Sharma Id No. 048000 22/08/2005;RR … WebFeb 15, 2024 · Shravan Hardikar (IAS 2005-Batch) will be taking over as Inspector, General, Registration and Controller of Stamp, Pune. Rajesh Patil (IAS 2005-Batch) has been given the charge of Municipal Commissioner, Pimpri-Chinchwad Municipal Corporation. Sheetal Ugale-Teli (IAS 2009-Batch) will be assuming the post of Director, Textile, Nagpur. airriva llc
Shravan Hardikar IAS Archives - LegendOfficers.com
WebFeb 12, 2024 · Uddhav transfers 6 IAS officers Chokalingam, settlement commissioner and director of land records, Pune, has been posted as director general, Yashwantrao Chavan … WebMar 7, 2024 · View Shravan Hardikar's business profile as Managing Director at Auto Cluster Development. Find contact's direct phone number, email address, work history, and more. WebApr 24, 2024 · By. Elets News Network. -. April 24, 2024. In a major reshuffle, as many as 60 IAS officers have been transferred in Maharashtra. Municipal Commissioner of Nagpur Shravan Hardikar has now been posted as Municipal Commissioner of Pimpri-Chinchwad Municipal Corporation. In place of Hardikar, Ashwin Mudgal who is currently the Collector … air rifle vermin control